Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/02/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/02/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/02/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/02/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/02/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/07/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/07/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/08/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/08/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/11/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/11/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/11/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/11/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/30/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/30/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/30/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/30/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/30/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/30/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/06/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/06/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/15/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/20/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/07/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/07/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/07/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/23/2003