Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/26/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/26/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/05/2003