There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Entrepreneurship and Benefits Improvement Act of 2003

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Entrepreneurship and Benefits Improvement Act of 2003

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Entrepreneurship Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve education and entrepreneurship benefits, housing benefits, and certain other benefits for veterans.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to permit the use of education benefits under such title for certain entrepreneurship courses, to permit veterans enrolled in a vocational rehabilitation program under chapter 31 of such title to have self-employment as a vocational goal, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/24/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 304).(text: CR 6/23/2003 H5675-5676)
06/05/2003Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-142, Part I.
03/27/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
06/25/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/24/2003-1:30pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/24/2003-1:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/24/2003-1:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 0 (Roll no. 304). (text: CR 6/23/2003 H5675-5676)
06/24/2003-1:18pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5743-5744)
06/23/2003-3:04pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/23/2003-2:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1460.
06/23/2003-2:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5675-5679)
06/23/2003-2:44pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/05/2003HouseHouse Committee on Small Business Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 7, 2003.
06/05/2003HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 108-142, Part I.
05/15/2003HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/15/2003HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/07/2003HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
05/07/2003HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
04/30/2003HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
04/24/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/27/2003HouseReferred to House Small Business
03/27/2003HouseReferred to House Veterans' Affairs
03/27/2003HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/27/2003HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E603)
03/27/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/27/2003 Referred to
05/15/2003 Markup by
06/05/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-142
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits04/24/2003 Referred to
04/30/2003 Hearings by
05/07/2003 Markup by
05/07/2003 Reported by
House Small Business03/27/2003 Referred to
Senate Veterans' Affairs06/25/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1460. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/24/2003)

Veterans Entrepreneurship and Benefits Improvement Act of 2003 - Authorizes a State agency to approve entrepreneurship (business education) courses for attendance by veterans using veterans' basic educational assistance provided through the Department of Veterans Affairs. Prohibits the Secretary of Veterans Affairs from treating a business owner as already qualified for such purposes. Includes entrepreneurship courses within authorized programs of veterans' education assistance.

Amends the Small Business Act to authorize a Federal contracting officer to award a sole source contract to any certified small business (one owned and controlled by service-disabled (qualified) veterans) if: (1) the certified business is determined to be responsible with respect to the performance of the contract opportunity and the contracting officer does not expect two or more such businesses to submit offers for such contract; (2) the anticipated award price of the contract will not exceed a specified amount; and (3) the contract award can be made at a fair and reasonable price. Allows a contracting officer to restrict contract competition to such businesses if the officer can reasonably expect two or more such businesses to submit offers. Directs the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA), at least every three years, to: (1) complete a survey of qualified veterans receiving such benefits; and (2) report survey results to Congress. Prohibits a contracting officer from making a procurement under this Act: (1) unless the officer has determined that such procurement cannot be made on the basis of a preference provided under another provision of the Small Business Act; or (2) if the procurement would otherwise be made from a different source under provisions of the Federal criminal code governing Government procurement of prisoner products or services or of the Javits-Wagner-O'Day Act. Outlines the appropriate order of priority, with the highest priority under small business start-up loans guaranteed by the SBA. Provides priority requirements with respect to a contracting officer of the Department of Veterans Affairs. Terminates that priority with respect to Department procurements after FY 2007.

Authorizes the Secretary to provide adapted housing assistance to certain categories of disabled military personnel (having suffered loss of limbs, organs, partial blindness or deafness, etc.) serving on active duty if the disability is the result of an injury or disease contracted or aggravated during such duty.

Increases from 65 to 85 the percentage of the number of purchases during a fiscal year of real property acquired by the Secretary as a result of default on guaranteed loans for the purchase or construction of homes for veterans that may be financed by a loan made by the Secretary.

Requires the payment of all accrued monetary benefits (currently limited to two years' worth) of a deceased veteran's beneficiary to the veteran or any other surviving dependent.