Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/02/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/08/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/08/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/08/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/11/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/30/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/06/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/14/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/20/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/22/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/04/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/04/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/04/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/05/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/11/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/11/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/11/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/11/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/11/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/11/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/11/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/11/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/11/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/11/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/11/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/11/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/11/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/11/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/12/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/12/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/17/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 06/17/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/23/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 07/08/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/08/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/08/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 07/08/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/08/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/09/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/10/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/16/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/16/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/16/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/17/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/21/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/03/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/04/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew