Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/09/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/09/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/23/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/23/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/24/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2003