Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/27/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/02/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/02/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/02/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/18/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/18/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/24/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/17/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/17/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/08/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/08/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/22/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/08/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/22/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/29/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/29/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/05/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/05/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/07/2004