Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/01/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/01/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/01/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/01/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/03/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/10/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/10/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/10/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/15/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/11/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/22/2004