Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/14/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/14/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/14/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/14/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/14/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/14/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/14/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/14/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/14/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/14/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/21/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/21/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/10/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/24/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/25/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/25/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/10/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/24/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/06/2004