Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/27/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/21/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/01/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/08/2004