Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/31/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/01/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/03/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/10/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/10/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/10/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/20/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/02/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/04/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/10/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/18/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/18/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/18/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/18/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/18/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/23/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/23/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/09/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/09/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/10/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/16/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/16/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/17/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/25/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/29/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/30/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/30/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/07/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/07/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/14/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/21/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/10/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/16/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/16/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/16/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/16/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/17/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/25/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/29/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/29/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/20/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/29/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/04/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/04/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/04/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/06/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/16/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/06/2004