Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/10/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/07/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/07/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/07/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/07/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/04/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/04/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/23/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/23/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/08/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/08/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/16/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/16/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 07/16/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/16/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/18/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/18/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/18/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/24/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/24/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/10/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/10/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/10/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/10/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/24/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/24/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/21/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/03/2004
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/15/2004