Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/31/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/11/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/01/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/01/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/01/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/06/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/14/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/21/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/09/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/09/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/09/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/09/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/24/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/10/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/10/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/25/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/25/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/25/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 09/25/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/08/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/20/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/28/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/05/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/05/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/03/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/03/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/16/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/23/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/23/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/23/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/23/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/23/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 09/23/2004
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/23/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/23/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/29/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/29/2004