Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/21/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/21/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/15/2003