Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/01/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/03/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/03/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/15/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/15/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/03/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/03/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/17/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/17/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/17/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/04/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/23/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/23/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/23/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/20/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/22/2004