Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/02/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/02/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/15/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/15/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/15/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/15/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/15/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/15/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/13/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/13/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/18/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/18/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 06/18/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/08/2004