Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/02/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/21/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/21/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/21/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/21/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/21/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/24/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/04/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/16/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/21/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/06/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/17/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/17/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/25/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/08/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/28/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/28/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/28/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/30/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/30/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/03/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/03/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/03/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/04/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/10/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/24/2004
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/01/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/20/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/20/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/28/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/01/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/09/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/09/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/21/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/07/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/08/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/23/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/23/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/28/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/28/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/07/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/16/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/16/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/16/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 11/16/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/16/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/16/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/16/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/17/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/17/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/17/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/17/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/17/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/17/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/18/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/18/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/18/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 11/18/2004
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/18/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/19/2004
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/19/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/06/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/06/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/06/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 12/06/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/06/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/06/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/06/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/07/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/07/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/07/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/07/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/07/2004