Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/02/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/02/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/08/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/08/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/10/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/11/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/07/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/09/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/25/2003