Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
07/29/2003 Became Public Law No: 108-64.
07/29/2003 Signed by President.
07/24/2003 Presented to President.
07/17/2003 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9605-9618; text as passed Senate: CR S9617-9618)
07/11/2003 Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 108-100.
05/14/2003 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4025)
04/02/2003 Introduced in House