Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/09/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/01/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/08/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/09/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/16/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/19/2003