Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/03/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/07/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/05/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/05/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/26/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/26/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/28/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/08/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/21/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 01/23/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/25/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/02/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/02/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/06/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/30/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew