Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/03/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/23/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/06/2004