Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/12/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/12/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/12/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/14/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/22/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/04/2003