Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/12/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/17/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/21/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/21/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/21/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/28/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/28/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/11/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/11/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/11/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/24/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/10/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/18/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/30/2004