There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To redesignate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 201 West Boston Street in Brookfield, Missouri, as the "Admiral Donald Davis Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
07/14/2003Became Public Law No: 108-55. (TXT | PDF)
07/14/2003Signed by President.
07/03/2003Presented to President.
06/25/2003Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8598-8599)
06/20/2003Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
05/07/2003Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 162).(text as passed House: CR 5/6/2003 H3655)
04/03/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/14/2003Became Public Law No: 108-55. (TXT | PDF)
07/14/2003Signed by President.
07/03/2003HousePresented to President.
06/26/2003SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/25/2003SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8598-8599)
06/20/2003SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 162.
06/20/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
06/17/2003SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/08/2003SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
05/07/2003-12:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/07/2003-12:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 0 (Roll no. 162). (text as passed House: CR 5/6/2003 H3655)
05/07/2003-12:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3712)
05/06/2003-2:59pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/06/2003-2:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1609.
05/06/2003-2:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3655)
05/06/2003-2:54pmHouseMr. Turner (OH) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/03/2003HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
04/03/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform04/03/2003 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs05/08/2003 Referred to
06/17/2003 Markup by
06/20/2003 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1609.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1609. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-55 (07/14/2003)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the United States Postal Service facility located at 201 West Boston Street in Brookfield, Missouri, as the Admiral Donald Davis Post Office Building.