Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/11/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/05/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/08/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/20/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/20/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/02/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/02/2003