Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/24/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/09/2004
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/09/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/09/2004