Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/03/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/30/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/30/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/03/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/07/2003