Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/01/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/01/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/01/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/15/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/22/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/22/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/05/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/12/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/12/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/12/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/12/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/12/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/12/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/19/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/19/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/23/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/23/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/23/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/23/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/24/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/26/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/09/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/09/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/09/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/15/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/16/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/16/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/22/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/22/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/22/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/24/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/05/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/05/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/05/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/16/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/23/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/23/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/23/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/14/2004