Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/11/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/19/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 07/16/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/25/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/25/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/20/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew