Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/30/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/30/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/30/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/13/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/14/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/12/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/12/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/12/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/24/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/24/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/24/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/10/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/10/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/21/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/20/2004