Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/30/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/30/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/30/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/30/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/23/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/17/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/07/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/18/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/25/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/27/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/27/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/16/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/08/2004
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/08/2004