Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/18/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/19/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/26/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/26/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/15/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/17/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/17/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/22/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/22/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/05/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/05/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/16/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/24/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/21/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 01/28/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/11/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/17/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/17/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/17/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/22/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/05/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/19/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/19/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/02/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 06/08/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/15/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/17/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/07/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/08/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/29/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/07/2004