Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/03/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/03/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/03/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/11/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/11/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/11/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/30/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/07/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/11/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/11/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/02/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/24/2004