Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/07/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/07/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/10/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/10/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/30/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/30/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/30/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/30/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/30/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/30/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/30/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/30/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/07/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/07/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/08/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/09/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/14/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/14/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/19/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/19/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/19/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/19/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/19/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/19/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/19/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/19/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/19/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/19/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/19/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/20/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/20/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/21/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/02/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/18/2003