Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/06/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/06/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 05/06/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/08/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/08/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/22/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/19/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/20/2003