There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Endangered Species Data Quality Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

Sound Science for Endangered Species Act Planning Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to require the Secretary of the Interior to give greater weight to scientific or commercial data that is empirical or has been field-tested or peer-reviewed, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/19/2004Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-785.
04/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
11/19/2004Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 479.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/19/2004Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-785.
07/21/2004Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 15.
07/21/2004Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/15/2003Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
04/08/2003Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/09/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/09/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/09/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/09/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/11/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/21/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/08/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/17/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources04/08/2003 Referred to
07/21/2004 Markup by
11/19/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-785

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1662. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (11/19/2004)

Endangered Species Data Quality Act of 2004 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to direct the Secretary of the Interior, when required to use the best scientific and commercial data available or the best scientific data available in determining that a species is an endangered or threatened species, to: (1) ensure that such data complies with specified guidelines and includes timely field survey data to the extent such data is available; and (2) give greater weight to scientific and commercial data that is empirical or that has been field-tested or peer-reviewed. Directs the Secretary to promulgate regulations that establish criteria for selecting and using such data.

Prohibits the Secretary from determining that a species is endangered or threatened unless the determination is supported by timely field data. Requires the Secretary to include in the rule-making record of such a determination data collected by real property owners or persons holding or applying for contracts, leases, or other permits for real property.

Requires the Secretary to publish, with notice of a proposed or final regulation, a description of additional scientific and commercial data that would assist in the preparation of a recovery plan.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Secretary to: (1) solicit recommendations from the National Academy of Sciences and the governors of affected States for qualified individuals to serve as independent reviewers for "covered actions" (defined to include proposed listings, delistings, or reclassifications of endangered or protected species, the development of recovery plans, and jeopardy determinations); and (2) appoint from such list three individuals who shall report to the Secretary on the scientific information and analyses on which a covered action is based.

Requires: (1) the Secretary to transmit to the independent reviewers all available scientific and commercial data in the administrative record with regard to an action; and (2) the reviewers to provide the Secretary with their response within three months of such transmission.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) publish notice of the draft determination regarding data on which a final determination will be based and provide an opportunity for public comment following receipt of the reviewers' response; and (2) include in the final determination a summary of each independent review (and, if reviewers' recommendations are rejected, an explanation for that decision).

(Sec. 4) Requires the Secretary, when consulting with a Federal agency to determine whether agency action will jeopardize an endangered or threatened species or destroy the critical habitat of such species, to: (1) actively solicit and consider information provided by governors of States where the agency action is located; (2) provide governors of States otherwise affected by such action with an opportunity to submit information; and (3) allow any person who has sought agency authorization or funding for an action to participate in related consultations and to make related comments or other information publicly available.