Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/09/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/09/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/09/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/09/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/09/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/11/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/14/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/21/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/21/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/03/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/08/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/16/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/16/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/24/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/17/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/2004