There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a Department of Peace.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/08/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
05/13/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
05/05/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/02/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/08/2003Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Referred to House International Relations
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committees on International Relations, the Judiciary, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2870)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/08/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/10/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2004
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/08/2004
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/08/2003 03/17/2004 --

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform04/08/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization05/13/2003 Referred to
House International Relations04/08/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary04/08/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security05/05/2003 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce04/08/2003 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness05/02/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1673.


Subjects (126)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1673. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/08/2003)

Establishes a Department of Peace, which shall be headed by a Secretary of Peace appointed by the President, with the advice and consent of the Senate. Sets forth the mission of the Department, including to: (1) hold peace as an organizing principle; (2) endeavor to promote justice and democratic principles to expand human rights; and (3) develop policies that promote national and international conflict prevention, nonviolent intervention, mediation, peaceful resolution of conflict, and structured mediation of conflict.

Establishes in the Department the Intergovernmental Advisory Council on Peace, which shall provide assistance and make recommendations to the Secretary and the President concerning intergovernmental policies relating to peace and nonviolent conflict resolution.

Transfers to the Department the functions, assets, and personnel of various Federal agencies.

Establishes a Federal Interagency Committee on Peace.

Establishes Peace Day. Urges all citizens to observe and celebrate the blessings of peace and endeavor to create peace on such day.