Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/10/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/10/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/10/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/11/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/11/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/30/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/30/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/30/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/30/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/30/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/01/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/06/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/15/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/09/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 06/10/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/11/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/12/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/17/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/23/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/26/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/30/2003