Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/01/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/03/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/03/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/10/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/10/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/18/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/09/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/09/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/14/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/14/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/18/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/18/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/23/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/24/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/04/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/10/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/24/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/24/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/24/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/05/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/28/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/03/2004