Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/08/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/09/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/29/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/14/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/15/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/25/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/04/2004