Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/09/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/09/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/11/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/11/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/22/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/16/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/16/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/16/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/16/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/16/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/16/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/16/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/16/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 07/16/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/16/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/24/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/15/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/19/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/19/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/19/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/19/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/19/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/19/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/19/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 11/19/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/19/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 11/21/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/08/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/28/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/28/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/20/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/05/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/05/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/05/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/17/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/07/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/15/2004