Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/09/2003