Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/09/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/09/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/11/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/06/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/13/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/13/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/13/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/20/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/20/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/20/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/21/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/10/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 06/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/24/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/24/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/16/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/10/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/10/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/20/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/20/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/20/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/12/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/12/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/18/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/16/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/05/2004