Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/29/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/01/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/06/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/09/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/15/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/15/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/15/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/22/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/22/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/03/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/03/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/04/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/04/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/10/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/10/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/10/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/10/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/10/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/10/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/11/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/19/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/19/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/03/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/10/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/29/2003