Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/06/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/13/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/13/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/03/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/14/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/20/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/28/2004