There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to enhance the authority of the Department of Veterans Affairs to recover from third parties costs of medical care furnished to veterans and other persons by the Department.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/10/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
05/15/2003Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/15/2003Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/06/2003Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
05/06/2003Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
04/24/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/11/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E755)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2003Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/20/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/10/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/10/2003 Referred to
05/15/2003 Markup by
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health04/24/2003 Referred to
05/06/2003 Markup by
05/06/2003 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1715.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1715. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2003)

Includes third-party insurance providers participating in the Medicare program and any department or agency of the United States other than the Department of Veterans Affairs among the entities from which the Department shall be authorized to recover payments for the costs of providing certain non-service-connected medical care to veterans.