Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/10/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/11/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/01/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/22/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/12/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/15/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/20/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/04/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/2004