Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/07/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/07/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/08/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/27/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/27/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/27/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/27/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 01/27/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/27/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/29/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/29/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/29/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/29/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/29/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/29/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/04/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/11/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/11/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/11/2003