Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/10/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/09/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/25/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/03/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/21/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/20/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/20/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/20/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/20/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/20/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/20/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/22/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/22/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/27/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/28/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/28/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/28/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/04/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/04/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/11/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/11/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/11/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/18/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/19/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/20/2004